EP3163286 - UNIVERSAL MACHINE FOR RHEOLOGICAL AND MECHANICAL TESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Castro Fontanella Pileggi, Gisele Rua Eugenio Bettarello nº. 55 apto. 162D 05616-090 São Paulo / BR | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 72 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15811493.4 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015IB54713 | Priority number, date | BR20141015604 | 24.06.2014 Original published format: BR102014015604 | [2017/18] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015198230 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | PT | [2015/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3163286 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/08, G01N33/38 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/383 (EP,US);
G01N11/14 (EP,US);
G01N2011/0026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | G01N11/08, B29C47/92 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE MASCHINE FÜR RHEOLOGISCHE UND MECHANISCHE TESTS | [2017/18] | English: | UNIVERSAL MACHINE FOR RHEOLOGICAL AND MECHANICAL TESTS | [2017/18] | French: | MACHINE UNIVERSELLE POUR TESTS RHÉOLOGIQUES ET MÉCANIQUES | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | Translation filed | 23.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 24.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5541855 (ENZLER RUEDI [CH], et al); | [Y]EP0798549 (FREEMAN REGINALD EDWARD [GB], et al); | [A]US6227039 (TE ENI MOSHE [IL]); | [A]US2008060423 (JAU WEN-CHEN [TW]) | International search | [A]US6649095 (BUJA FREDERICK J [US]); | [A]US6804563 (LAFAYE DE MICHEAUX DANIEL [FR]); | [A]US7233834 (MCDONALD JR JOHN T [US], et al); | [A]US2007193234 (FOX ANDY [US], et al); | [A]US7770436 (BAEK SEONG-GI [US]) |