EP3160477 - PRMT5 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epizyme, Inc. 400 Technology Square, 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, Kenneth, W. 105 Briar Lane Westwood, MA 02090 / US | 02 /
CHESWORTH, Richard 584 Strawberry Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 03 /
SHAPIRO, Gideon 5507 NW 80th Avenue Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 04 /
OLHAVA, Edward, James 11 Scarsdale Road Newton, MA 02460 / US | 05 /
PATANE, Michael, A. 6 Westwind Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 06 /
MUNCHHOF, Michael John 266 West Road Salem, Connecticut 06420 / US | 07 /
KUNTZ, Kevin Wayne 8 New Village Road Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | 08 /
JIN, Lei 8 Harris Avenue Wellesley, Massachusetts 02481 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15811525.3 | 25.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US37768 | Priority number, date | US201462017055P | 25.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462017055 P | US201462051751P | 17.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462051751 P | US201462064357P | 15.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462064357 P | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015200680 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3160477 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7076, C07H19/167, C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61P7/00, A61P3/00, A61K31/52, A61K31/4747, A61K31/4748, A61K31/4709, A61K31/506, C07D417/12, C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D401/14, A61P3/10 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
C07H19/16 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP,US);
C07C311/41 (EP,US);
C07D205/04 (EP,US);
C07D207/14 (EP,US);
C07D207/273 (EP,US);
C07D211/28 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D233/88 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/07] | A61K31/7076, C07H19/167, C07D487/04, A61P35/00, A61P7/00, A61P3/00, A61K31/52 | ||
Former IPC [2017/18] | A61K31/7076 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | 06.12.2016 | ME | 06.12.2016 | Title | German: | PRMT5-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/18] | English: | PRMT5 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2017/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PRMT5 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 06.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0119821 (AVENTIS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,11-13 * in particular the claims and example 104 *; | [X]WO0119833 (AVENTIS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,11-13 * in particular the claims and examples 56 and 107 *; | [A]WO2008104077 (METHYLGENE INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,4,5,11-16 * in particular the claims and compound 100d in table 3 *; | [XY]WO2009018541 (SOUTHERN RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-16 * the whole document; in particular the claims; pages 1-2; compounds 4h, 9f, 12, 14d, 14e, 15c, 18a, 18b, 19b, 20b * [Y] 1,2,6,7,12-16; | [XY]WO2012075500 (EPIZYME INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-16 * the whole document; in particular the claims and figures; formulae xiii and viii; page 25; compounds 8, 9, 16-21 * [Y] 1,2,6,7,12-16; | [XY]WO2012075492 (EPIZYME INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-16 * the whole document, in partiular the claims; examples 1-3, 10, 12 * [Y] 1,2,6,7,12-16; | [XY]US2012142625 (OLHAVA EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,12-16 * the whole document, in particular the claims; table 1 * [Y] 1,2,6,7,12-16; | [XDI]WO2012082436 (EPIZYME INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,6,7,12-16 * the whole document; in particular the claims; page 32 lines 4-14; pages 24-30; e.g. compound 81; examples and figures * [I] 1,2,6,7,12-16; | [XP]WO2014100719 (EPIZYME INC [US]) [XP] 1,4,5,11-16 * the whole document; in particular the claims, e.g. compounds 1, 2, 8-10, 12-14, 16, 19, 20, 34-38, 42-45, 50, 53, 55, 58, 60, 62, 63, 104-109, 176, 177, 196-199, 321, 322, 329-331, 346, 347, 394 etc. pp. *; | [XP]WO2014100695 (EPIZYME INC [US]) [XP] 1,4,5,11-16* the whole document; in particular the claims; e.g. compounds 40, 44, 45, 52, 58-60, 65, 76, 78, 80-86, 89, 97, 98, 101, 103-109, 112-115, 123, 125, ...., 257, 258, ... *; | [XY] - YU WENYU ET AL, "Bromo-deaza-SAH: A potent and selective DOT1L inhibitor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, (20130130), vol. 21, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2013.01.049, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 1787 - 1794, XP029002562 [X] 1,2,7,15,16 * in particular the abstract; figures 1, 4, 5; table 1; page 1791 left-hand column * [Y] 1,2,6,7,12-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2013.01.049 | [X] - BERGMANN J ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP OF SOME NEW BETHA-BLOCKING AGENTS WITH POSSIBLE ALPHA-ADRENORECEPTOR ACTIVITY", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, WILEY VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (19900101), vol. 323, no. 7, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 387 - 391, XP002059755 [X] 1,11 * compound 10c in table 1 and 2, figure 1, scheme 1 and on page 390 * | International search | [A]US2007004695 (FINK DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2010190788 (DEFERT OLIVIER [FR], et al) [A] 1, 15 * entire document *; | [A]WO2014048547 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1, 15 * entire document *; | [XP]WO2014100719 (EPIZYME INC [US]) [XP] 1, 15* entire document *; | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20110119), Database accession no. 103937775, XP055375460 [A] 1, 15 * . entire document * | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20110222), Database accession no. 107215563, XP055375463 [A] 1, 15 * . entire document * | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20110310), Database accession no. 112367837 [A] 1, 15 * . entire document * |