EP3162969 - WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE AND BATHTUB DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIXIL Corporation 2-1-1 Ojima Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8535 / JP | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Masashi c/o LIXIL Corporation 2-1-1 Ojima Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8535 / JP | 02 /
ICHIKAWA, Yuichiro c/o LIXIL Corporation 2-1-1 Ojima Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8535 / JP | 03 /
HIRAIWA, Hiromitsu c/o LIXIL Corporation 2-1-1 Ojima Koto-ku Tokyo 136-8535 / JP | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 15811625.1 | 22.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015JP67841 | Priority number, date | JP20140129729 | 24.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014129729 | [2017/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015199014 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162969 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/042, A47K3/02, A47K3/28, B05B1/04, E03C1/04 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
E03C1/0404 (EP);
A47K3/28 (EP);
B05B1/044 (EP);
A47K3/02 (EP);
B05B17/085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | E03C1/042, A47K3/02, A47K3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | WASSERAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG UND BADEWANNENVORRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | WATER DISCHARGE DEVICE AND BATHTUB DEVICE | [2017/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION D'EAU ET DISPOSITIF DE BAIGNOIRE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | Translation filed | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/18] | 01.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 17.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2206399 (MASCO CORP) [A] 5,6 * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]DE202008004921U (NEOPERL GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,6* paragraph [0035]; figure - *; | [A]US2010187326 (PAROONAGIAN GARO [US], et al) [A] 1,3,7,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0036] - [0038]; figure - *; | [E]EP3195772 (LIXIL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,7,10,11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0312968U (Toto Ltd.) [Y] 1-5, 7-11 * , page 5, line 6 to page 7, line 14; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2002153391 (YAMAHA LIVING TEC) [Y] 8-11* , paragraphs [0012] to [0014]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2004176268 (YAMAHA LIVING TEC) [Y] 1-5, 7-11 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0018], [0032] to [0039]; fig. 5, 6 (Family: none) * [A] 6 |