EP3163881 - BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING DEVICE, BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Sejin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11 gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jangwon IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11 gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Sungryong IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11 gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
KO, Woosuk IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11 gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15811730.9 | 24.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015KR06422 | Priority number, date | US201462017241P | 25.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462017241 P | [2017/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015199439 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163881 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234, H04N21/236, H04N21/235 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04L67/30 (EP,US);
H04N21/234 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1066 (US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4825 (EP,US);
H04N21/6106 (KR);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04L69/326 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,US);
H04N21/64322 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | RUNDFUNKSIGNALSENDEVORRICHTUNG, RUNDFUNKSIGNALEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG, RUNDFUNKSIGNALSENDEVERFAHREN UND RUNDFUNKSIGNALEMPFANGSVERFAHREN | [2017/18] | English: | BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING DEVICE, BROADCAST SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND BROADCAST SIGNAL RECEIVING METHOD | [2017/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE DIFFUSION | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | Translation filed | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011088259 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011088264 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]EP2362650 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]EP2536136 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2555510 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013036234 (PAZOS CARLOS M D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [X]EP2618563 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014143811 (LEE JOONHUI [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2015088292 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3131304 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20080005063 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0059]-[0068], [0095]-[0108]; claims 1-3; and figures 9, 14. *; | [A]KR20090021122 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0067]; claim 11; and figure 1. *; | [X]KR20090031323 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0272]-[0277], [0284]-[0287], [0291]-[0310]; claim 1; and figure 27. *; | [A]KR20090060530 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0043]; claim 11; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20100075656 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0033]-[0063]; claims 1, 3; and figure 5. * |