EP3109313 - CULTURE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissha Printing Co., Ltd. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBI, Naoko c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 02 /
ONISHI, Atsushi c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | 03 /
IGA, Toshihiro c/o NISSHA PRINTING CO. LTD. 3 Mibu Hanai-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8551 / JP | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | KASTEL Patentanwälte PartG mbB St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Kastel, Stefan Kastel Patentanwälte St.-Cajetan-Straße 41 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15811969.3 | 10.06.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015JP66767 | Priority number, date | JP20140129567 | 24.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014129567 | JP20140181097 | 05.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014181097 | [2016/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015198866 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109313 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, C12M1/00, C12M1/32, B01L3/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C12M29/20 (EP,US);
C12M29/00 (KR);
C12M1/34 (KR);
C12M23/12 (EP,KR,US);
C12M23/38 (EP,US);
C12M41/46 (KR);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0854 (EP,US);
B01L3/50853 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | C12M3/00, C12M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | KULTURBEHÄLTER | [2016/52] | English: | CULTURE CONTAINER | [2016/52] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE CULTURE | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | Translation filed | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 19.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4321330 (BAKER FRASER L, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, lines 53-59; figure 2; claim 1 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]WO02087763 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 7, paragraph 4; figures 5-9; claim 1 * [I] 3-6; | [XI]US2009272748 (WELCH DANIEL P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, column 1 bottom; figures 1a-1e * [I] 3-6; | [XA]WO2010087987 (US NAVY [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028]; figure 4c * [A] 2-6; | [A]WO03066907 (GENOME THERAPEUTICS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2006320323 (MILLIPORE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0004] to [0007], [0010]; fig. 3 & US 2006/0263875 A1 & EP 1724019 A1 & KR 10-2006-0120421 A *; | [A]JP2010527582 (Nikon Corp.) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0007], [0009], [0031], [0043], [0057]; fig. 1 to 8 & US 2010/0136671 A1 & WO 2008/149914 A2 *; | [A]JPH05181068 (HOYA CORP, et al) [A] 1-6 * , abstract; claims; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006023644 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-6 * , abstract; claims; fig. 3 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS63186298U (Kurabo Industries Ltd.) [A] 1-6 * , claims; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014079227 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-6 * , examples; fig. 2A, B, 5A (Family: none) * |