EP3203827 - EAR STRIPPER; HARVESTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/33] | STRIPPER-HARVESTER; HARVESTING DEVICE | ||
[2018/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fink, Lucian Andrej Hülenbergstrasse 20 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Müller, Thomas Patentanwälte Schuster, Müller & Partner mbB Alexanderstraße 92 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Müller, Thomas Patentanwälte Schuster, Müller & Partner mbB Wiederholdstraße 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15813248.0 | 06.10.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015DE00508 | Priority number, date | DE20141014871 | 06.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014014871 | [2017/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016055049 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3203827 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203827 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/44, A01D41/08, A01D45/04, A01D41/06 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A01D41/06 (EP,US);
A01F12/182 (US);
A01D41/08 (EP,US);
A01D45/04 (EP,US);
A01D63/00 (US);
A01F12/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | A01D41/06, A01D45/04, A01D41/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄHRENSTRIPPER; ERNTEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/33] | English: | EAR STRIPPER; HARVESTING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF À ENLEVER DES ÉPIS; DISPOSITIF DE RÉCOLTE | [2018/32] |
Former [2017/33] | STRIPPER-HARVESTER; HARVESTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2017/33] | BATTEUSE À ÉPIS; DISPOSITIF DE RÉCOLTE | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 24.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2015 | AL | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.10.2015 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.10.2015 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]GB2200526 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,2,5-8 * figures 1-5 * * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line 14 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 15 * * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 11 * [A] 22-25 [Y] 16-21,26-28 [I] 3; | [A]EP0346342 (KLINNER WILFRED E) [A] 16 * figures 22,22b * * column 28, line 34 - column 30, line 24 * * column 30, line 37 - column 31, line 6 *; | [XI]GB2219919 (KLINNER WILFRED E) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figures 1-21 * * page 24, paragraph 4 - page 25, paragraph 3 * * page 31, paragraph 4 - page 32, paragraph 2 * [I] 3,14; | [XAYI]US4991385 (KLINNER WILFRED E [GB]) [X] 1-9,15 * figures 1,4-7a,11a-13c, 17 * * column 6, lines 25-28 * * column 14, lines 48-60 * * column 16, lines 28-65 * * column 18, line 67 - column 19, line 3 * * column 24, lines 10-33 * * column 24, line 55 - column 25, line 14 * * column 25, lines 52-55 * [A] 22-25 [Y] 16-21,26-28 [I] 14; | [XI]DE69009723T (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * figures 1-3a * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 14 * [I] 14; | [XAI]DE3587945T (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-8,15 * figures 1a-8a * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 2 * * page 22, paragraph 3 - page 23, line 6 * * page 24, paragraph 2 * * page 27, lines 1-5, paragraph 2 * * page 27, paragraph 3 - page 28, paragraph 1 * [A] 12,13 [I] 3,14; | [XI]DE69109659T (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-8,15 * figures 1,2,7a-8b * * pages 9-10 * * page 12, lines 10-28, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 3 * [I] 3,14; | [XI]DE3854083T (KLINNER [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * figures 1-14 * * page 12, line 37 - page 13, line 36 * * page 14, lines 6-37 * * page 15, lines 2-7,18-26 * [I] 3,14; | [A]DE69523504T (SHELBOURNE REYNOLDS ENG [GB]) [A] 16,17* figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [XI]EA200900219 (BATURIN VIKTOR NIKOLAEVICH [RU]; CHUKSIN PETR IVANOVICH [BY]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * figures 1-4 * [I] 14; | [XI]JP2012000084 (YANMAR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 1-5 * [I] 3,14 |