EP3224166 - BELT CONVEYOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A MESH BELT AND A SHEET CONVEYOR SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING SHEETS IN A REPROGRAPHIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCE-Technologies B.V. P.O. Box 101 St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIETBERGEN, Mark St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | 02 /
PRINSEN, Kevin H.J.R. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Canon Production Printing IP Department Canon Production Printing Netherlands B.V. Van der Grintenstraat 10 5914 HH Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | OCE IP Department St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 15813709.1 | 27.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP77907 | Priority number, date | EP20140195331 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14195331 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016083572 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224166 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/22, B65H29/24, B41J11/00, B65H7/02, B65H7/14 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
B65H7/14 (EP,US);
B41J11/007 (EP,US);
B65H29/242 (EP,US);
B65H5/224 (EP,US);
B65H7/02 (EP,US);
G03G15/6529 (US);
B65H2404/211 (EP,US);
B65H2404/224 (EP,US);
B65H2404/271 (EP,US);
B65H2404/282 (EP,US);
B65H2404/283 (EP,US);
B65H2404/285 (EP,US);
B65H2511/20 (EP,US);
B65H2511/512 (EP,US);
B65H2553/412 (EP,US);
B65H2553/414 (EP,US);
B65H2553/416 (EP,US);
B65H2801/06 (EP,US);
B65H2801/27 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/20, B65H2220/02, B65H2220/11 (US,EP);
B65H2511/512, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/40] | B65H5/22, B65H29/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | BANDFÖRDERSYSTEM MIT EINEM GITTERBAND UND BOGENFÖRDERSYSTEM ZUM FÖRDERN VON BÖGEN IN EINER REPROGRAFISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | BELT CONVEYOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A MESH BELT AND A SHEET CONVEYOR SYSTEM FOR CONVEYING SHEETS IN A REPROGRAPHIC APPARATUS | [2017/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORTEUR À BANDE COMPRENANT UNE BANDE À MAILLES ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORTEUR À BANDE POUR TRANSPORTER DES FEUILLES DANS UN APPAREIL DE REPROGRAPHIE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3741116 (GREEN M, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5119938 (BECKH GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 1-13; | [A]US2009145729 (ENOMOTO KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2684821 (SANWA TECHNO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |