EP3233583 - PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/43] | DEFORMATION STRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | ||
[2019/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIF, Öztzan Rose-Pichler-Weg 27 80937 München / DE | 02 /
FICHTINGER, Gerhard Eichenzaunweg 18A 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | 03 /
RIEDL, Wilhelm Egerlaender Strasse 1 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15813727.3 | 08.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP78930 | Priority number, date | DE201410226363 | 18.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014226363 | DE201510207610 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015207610 | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096528 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233583 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3233583 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34, B60R19/18, B60R19/28, B64C1/06, F16F7/12 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP,CN,US);
B60R19/34 (US);
B60R19/023 (US);
B60R19/26 (US);
B60R19/28 (EP,CN,US);
B60R19/30 (US);
B60R21/34 (EP,CN,US);
F16F7/125 (EP,US);
B60R2019/007 (EP,CN,US);
B60R2019/186 (EP,CN,US);
B60R2019/262 (EP,CN,US);
B60R2019/268 (EP,CN,US);
F16F7/121 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEFORMATIONSSTRUKTUR, INSBESONDERE ZUM FUSSGÄNGERSCHUTZ FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2017/43] | English: | PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2019/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE PIÉTON POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2019/18] |
Former [2017/43] | DEFORMATION STRUCTURE, IN PARTICULAR FOR PEDESTRIAN PROTECTION FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | ||
Former [2017/43] | STRUCTURE DE DÉFORMATION, EN PARTICULIER POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE POUR LA PROTECTION DE PIÉTONS | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2015 | AL | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | IE | 08.12.2019 | LU | 08.12.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4844213 (TRAVIS WILLIAM B [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE29700017U (BALL WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 1* figure . *; | [XI]WO0218816 (DYNOTEC GES ZUR ENTWICKLUNG IN [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,10-12 * lines 6-10 - page 5; figures 1-3 * [I] 8; | [A]EP2266846 (FAURECIA EXTERIORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1c,2c,2d * |