EP3164841 - ENHANCED USER AUTHENTICATION PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International, Inc. 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, NY 10577 / US | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMAL, Ashfaq 27 Barker Avenue Apt. 310 White Plains, NY 10601 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Gregory, D. 474 Woodbine Road Stamford, CT 06903 / US | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Fountain, Sullivan, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 15814066.5 | 01.07.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015US38797 | Priority number, date | US201462020555P | 03.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462020555 P | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016004183 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3164841 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q20/32, G09C1/00 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G06Q20/405 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/19] | G06Q20/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSPLATTFORM | [2017/19] | English: | ENHANCED USER AUTHENTICATION PLATFORM | [2017/19] | French: | PLATEFORME D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UTILISATEUR AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010146263 (DAS TAMAL [IN], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0033] * * figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US2013212020 (TURGEON PAUL [US]) [X] 1-3, 5, 6, 9-13, 16-18 * ; Figure 1; Paragraphs [0011], [0020], [0039]-[0040], [0049], [0051], [0054]-[0055], [0070], [0073]-[0075] * [Y] 4, 7, 8, 14, 15; | [Y]US2012019379 (BEN AYED MOURAD [US]) [Y] 4, 7, 8, 14, 15 * ; Paragraphs [0087], [0096], [0171], [0278], [0280]. [0303] *; | [A]US2008209545 (ASANO TOMOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2004187018 (OWEN WILLIAM N [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * ; entire document * |