EP3161760 - IMPROVED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TIMEKEEPING ENTRY AND WORK IN PROGRESS REPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shaaban, Ahmed 1 East Wacker Suite 2150 Chicago, IL 60601 / US | For all designated states Thandra, Venkat 1 East Wacker Suite 2150 Chicago IL 60601 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Thibon, Laurent Cabinet Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 15814531.8 | 30.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US38691 | Priority number, date | US201461998577P | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US 201461998577 P | US201514545345 | 25.04.2015 Original published format: US201514545345 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016004123 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161760 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q20/14, G06Q30/04, G06Q10/10 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1091 (EP,US);
G06Q40/10 (EP,US);
G09C1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | G06Q10/10, G06Q30/04, G07C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN VON BERICHTEN ZUR ZEITERFASSUNGSEINGABE UND ZU LAUFENDEN ARBEITEN | [2017/18] | English: | IMPROVED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TIMEKEEPING ENTRY AND WORK IN PROGRESS REPORTS | [2017/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉS POUR ENTRÉE DE MESURE DE TEMPS ET RAPPORTS DE TRAVAUX EN COURS | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2019 | 09.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/21] | 13.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US6622128 (BEDELL JERRY L [US], et al) [X] 2-4, 10-24, 26-28, 34-48 * , abstract, col. 12, lines 28-49, col.15, lines 8-27, col.19, line 54 -col. 24, line 51, col.25, line 13 -col.26, line 3, col.28, lines 9-29, lines 35-36, lines 55-61, col.31, lines 8-15, col.41, lines 3-10, claim 1, fig. 1, 6, 12-22, 25, 26, 29 * [Y] 1, 5-9, 25, 29-33; | [Y]US2008033851 (WILLIAMS JOSHUA M [US], et al) [Y] 1, 5-9, 25, 29-33 * , paragraph [0035], claim 13 *; | [A]US2009106132 (ISTURIZ GABRIELA [US], et al)[A] 1-48; | [A]US8229810 (BUTERA CYNTHIA S [US], et al) [A] 1-48 |