EP3160418 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TRACKING INVENTORY AND DISTRIBUTION OF MEDICATIONS IN A HEALTHCARE FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TouchPoint Medical, Inc. 210 North Brinton Lake Road Concordville, PA 19331 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NACKLEY, John G. 651 North Washington Street Wilkes-Barre, Pennsylvania 18705 / US | 02 /
SOBIE, Robert 651 North Washington Street Wilkes-Barre, Pennsylvania 18705 / US | 03 /
OLSON, Jeffrey C. 651 North Washington Street Wilkes-Barre, Pennsylvania 18705 / US | 04 /
ROSS, Graham 651 North Washington Street Wilkes-Barre, Pennsylvania 18705 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15814560.7 | 29.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US38229 | Priority number, date | US201462018711P | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462018711 P | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016003855 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3160418 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00, G16H40/20 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP);
G16H20/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | A61J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR INVENTARVERFOLGUNG UND VERTEILUNG VON MEDIKAMENTEN IN EINER GESUNDHEITSVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TRACKING INVENTORY AND DISTRIBUTION OF MEDICATIONS IN A HEALTHCARE FACILITY | [2017/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SUIVI DE L'INVENTAIRE ET DE LA DISTRIBUTION DE MÉDICAMENTS DANS UN ÉTABLISSEMENT DE SOINS DE SANTÉ | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 30.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2020 | 19.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/46] | 02.07.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | EP20191811.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 22.09.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CA2509787 (MDG MEDICAL INC [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 9] , [0 10] - [0013] - [0 16] , [0 27]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2009138122 (WAGNER DAVID J [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 48] , [0 66] , [0 78] *; | [I]US2012137706 (HUSSAIN SHARIQ [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 52] , [0 53] , [0 72] , [0 73] , [ 135 ] - [0137] *; | [A]US2010114367 (BARRETT JOHN TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2011166700 (DUNN LAWRENCE A [US]) [X] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]US2004046020 (ANDREASSON CHRISTER O [US], et al) [X] 11-22 * entire document *; | [A]WO2014089083 (MYLAN INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2014055267 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2013030566 (SHAVELSKY ERAN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2008172253 (CHUNG WAI YEE JOANNE [HK], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2002032582 (FEENEY ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document * |