EP3165603 - PANCREATIC ENDOCRINE CELLS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND TRANSDIFFERENTIATION AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juntendo Educational Foundation 2-1-1, Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | [2019/12] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Saitama Medical University 38, Morohongo Moroyama-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama 350-0495 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Masahito c/o Saitama Medical University Morohongo 38 Moroyama-machi Iruma-gun Saitama 350-0495 / JP | 02 /
OKAZAKI, Yasushi c/o Saitama Medical University Morohongo 38 Moroyama-machi Iruma-gun Saitama 350-0495 / JP | 03 /
SUGAHARA, Izumi c/o Saitama Medical University Morohongo 38 Moroyama-machi Iruma-gun Saitama 350-0495 / JP | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 15815940.0 | 03.07.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015JP69296 | Priority number, date | JP20140137719 | 03.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014137719 | [2017/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016002937 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165603 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3165603 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N15/09 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
C12N2501/60 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2506/1307 (EP,US);
C12N2506/14 (EP,US);
C12N2506/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOKRINE PANKREASZELLEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND TRANSDIFFERENZIERUNGSMITTEL | [2017/19] | English: | PANCREATIC ENDOCRINE CELLS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND TRANSDIFFERENTIATION AGENT | [2017/19] | French: | CELLULES ENDOCRINES PANCRÉATIQUES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELLES-CI ET AGENT DE TRANSDIFFÉRENCIATION | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | Translation filed | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2015 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.07.2015 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03078636 (UNIV BATH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 13, lines 5-11 *; | [Y]US2009280096 (KUBO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2011112015 (JULIER CECILE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2013029423 (YAMANAKA SHINYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y] - AKINCI E ET AL, "Reprogramming of pancreatic exocrine cells towards a beta (beta) cell character using Pdx1, Ngn3 and MafA", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS LTD, GB, (20120315), vol. 442, no. Part 3, doi:10.1042/BJ20111678, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 539 - 550, XP002725446 [Y] 1-12 * figures 1A, 4A * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20111678 | [Y] - MOMOKO MAEKAWA ET AL, "Direct reprogramming of somatic cells is promoted by maternal transcription factor Glis1", NATURE, (20110609), vol. 474, no. 7350, doi:10.1038/nature10106, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 225 - 229, XP055034083 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10106 | [A] - MFOPOU JOSUÉ KUNJOM ET AL, "Recent advances and prospects in the differentiation of pancreatic cells from human embryonic stem cells", DIAB, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, US, (20100901), vol. 59, no. 9, doi:10.2337/DB10-0439, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 2094 - 2101, XP009138606 [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/db10-0439 | [T] - DAVID W. SCOVILLE ET AL, "GLIS1-3: emerging roles in reprogramming, stem and progenitor cell differentiation and maintenance", STEM CELL INVESTIGATION, (20170927), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:10.21037/sci.2017.09.01, pages 80 - 80, XP055431048 [T] * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.21037/sci.2017.09.01 | International search | [YA] - KANG H.S. et al., "Transcription factor Glis3, a novel critical player in the regulation of pancreatic P- cell development and insulin gene expression", Mol. Cell . Biol., (20091200), vol. 29, no. 24, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 6366 - 6379, XP055062862 [Y] 1-2, 4-9, 11-12 * , particularly, abstract, fig. 10 * [A] 3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.01259-09 | [YA] - KIM Y.S. et al., "Glis3 regulates neurogenin 3 expression in pancreatic p-cells and interacts with its activator", Hnf6, Mol. Cells, (20120800), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 1016-8478, pages 193 - 200, XP055250727 [Y] 1-2, 4-9, 11-12 * , particularly, abstract * [A] 3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10059-012-0109-z | [YA] - YANG Y. et al., "The Krueppel-like zinc finger protein GLIS3 transactivates neurogenin 3 for proper fetal pancreatic islet differentiation in mice", Diabetologia, (20111000), vol. 54, no. 10, ISSN 1432-0428, pages 2595 - 2605, XP019948984 [Y] 1-2, 4-9, 11-12 * , particularly, abstract * [A] 3, 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-011-2255-9 |