EP3224391 - APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCTION AND SEPARATION OF GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydrox Holdings Limited 32 Ida Street Menlyn 0181 Pretoria / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Hydrox Holdings Limited 32 Ida Street Menlyn 0181 Pretoria / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAGNOSTOPOULOS, George 7 Mallet Street Mindalore 1739 Krugersdorp / ZA | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Titmus, Craig Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Titmus, Craig Edward, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15816523.3 | 27.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015IB59162 | Priority number, date | ZA20140008766 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: ZA 201408766 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084037 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224391 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/03, C25B1/06, C25B9/02, C25B15/08 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C25B1/04 (EP,CN);
C25B11/031 (EP,CN);
C25B11/00 (EP);
C25B9/63 (EP,CN);
C25B15/08 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND TRENNUNG VON GASEN | [2017/40] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCTION AND SEPARATION OF GASES | [2017/40] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION ET DE SÉPARATION DE GAZ | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013118104 (HYDROX HOLDINGS LTD [ZA]) [X] 1-22 * claims 1-28 * * figure 1 * * page 10, line 12 - page 15, line 23 *; | [Y]US2013206609 (ANAGNOSTOPOULOS GEORGE [ZA]) [Y] 1-22 * claims 1-6,11,13-16,18,20,24 * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - MARINI STEFANIA ET AL, "Advanced alkaline water electrolysis", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, (20120512), vol. 82, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2012.05.011, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 384 - 391, XP028939113 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 387, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 387, column r, paragraph 3 - page 388, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2012.05.011 | by applicant | US2002074237 | US8357269 | US4620902 |