EP3221033 - CONCENTRATION CONTROL IN FILTRATION SYSTEMS, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGOVERN, Ronan K. 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
LIENHARD V, John H. 15 Woodland Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15816552.2 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US60972 | Priority number, date | US201462080675P | 17.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462080675 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081399 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221033 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/02, B01D61/12, B01D61/14, B01D61/22, C12G3/08 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
B01D61/12 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D61/029 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D61/146 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D61/22 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12C11/11 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12H3/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D2311/08 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2311/2523 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D2317/022 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/08, B01D2311/04, B01D2311/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | KONZENTRATIONSSTEUERUNG IN FILTRATIONSSYSTEMEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2017/39] | English: | CONCENTRATION CONTROL IN FILTRATION SYSTEMS, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2017/39] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE LA CONCENTRATION DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE FILTRATION ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US4499117 (BONNEAU MARC [FR]); | [I]US4532140 (BONNOME JEAN-PIERRE [FR]); | [A]US4610887 (GALZY PIERRE [FR], et al); | [X]WO9208783 (DOW DANMARK [DK], et al); | [X]EP2008702 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) |