Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102542734B | Global Dossier | 12.06.2023 | B1 | KR20170092668 | 11.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015US62850 | 28.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018505463 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015US62850 | 28.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107005739B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2020 | B | CN107005739 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015US62850 | 28.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3227886 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015US62850 | 28.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016089713 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11327711 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2022 | B2 | US2016162259 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414562491 | 05.12.2014 |