EP3233785 - FLUORINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDRICH, Reiner Heidelberger Strasse 13 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15817071.2 | 16.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP02528 | Priority number, date | EP20140004336 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14004336 | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096128 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233785 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/653, C07F7/18, C09D4/00, A62D3/176 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
C07C69/653 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D5/00 (US);
A62D3/176 (CN);
C07F7/1804 (EP,CN,US);
C09D183/08 (US);
C09D4/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | FLUORVERBINDUNGEN | [2017/43] | English: | FLUORINE COMPOUNDS | [2017/43] | French: | COMPOSÉS FLUORÉS | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 12.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1511992 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13 * Sample No. 5-7 in Tabelle 1 auf Seite 4 *; | [X]WO02103103 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13* Verbindung CH2=CHCO2CH(CH2OCH2CF2CFHCF3)2 in Beispiel 3 *; | [X]WO2009103613 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13,15,17,18 * Verbindungen 2,2,3,4,4,4-Hexafluorobutyl(meth)acrylat (Anspruch 6) *; | [XAI] - T M ALEKSANDROVA ET AL, "MODIFICATION OF THE SURFACE PROPERTIES OF CELLULOSE MATERIALS BY GRAFTING FLUORALKYL(METH)ACRYLATES", POLYMER SCIENCE U.S.S.R., (19710101), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 2595 - 2600, XP055249073 [X] 1,2,4-8,12,13,15,17,18 * the whole document * * Verbindung alpha,alpha,gamma-Trihydroperfluorbutylmethacrylat (Seite 2920, Absatz 7) * [A] 9-11 [I] 3,14 | [X] - PALETA O ET AL, "Radical addition reactions of fluorinated species Part 6. Regioselectivity of the addition of nucleophilic radicals to halogenopropenes and evidence for a steric effect of the chlorine substituent", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, NL, (19971205), vol. 86, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0022-1139(97)00083-3, ISSN 0022-1139, pages 155 - 171, XP004107216 [X] 1,4-8,12,13 * Verbindung 27 in Schema 9 auf Seite 161 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(97)00083-3 | by applicant | - A. A. LL'IN ET AL., RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 80, no. 3, pages 405 - 418 |