EP3227189 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STACKING PACKAGES OF DIFFERENT SIZES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIVES SYLEPS ROBOTICS Parc d'activités Algayon 2 route Robert Algayon 33640 Ayguemorte Les Graves / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states FIVES SYLEPS ROBOTICS Parc d'activités Algayon 2 route Robert Algayon 33640 Ayguemorte Les Graves / FR | ||
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states Synapse Robotics Parc d'activités Algayon 2 Route Robert Algayon 33640 Ayguemorte Les Graves / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Benoist 26 Avenue du Bois du Moulin 33360 Cenac / FR | 02 /
OUY, Samuel 58 Avenue de la Libération Domaine de Castelnaud 33490 Saint Pierre d'Aurillac / FR | 03 /
BOISNARD, Thierry 7 Avenue de la République 33140 Villenave d'Ornon / FR | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2017/41] | Benech, Frédéric Cabinet Benech 15, rue d'Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15817456.5 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015FR53266 | Priority number, date | FR20140061716 | 01.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1461716 | [2017/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016087760 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227189 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3227189 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/50, B65B43/00, B65B43/58, B65G57/03, B65G57/24, B65G61/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
B65B35/50 (EP);
B65G57/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STAPELN VON VERPACKUNGEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER GRÖSSEN | [2017/41] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STACKING PACKAGES OF DIFFERENT SIZES | [2017/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'EMPILAGE DE COLIS DE TAILLES DIFFÉRENTES | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 31.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2019
26.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Vanderlande Industries B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2 5466 RB Veghel / NL Opponent's representative Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2019/31] | 08.07.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.09.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.11.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/14] | Appeal following opposition | 17.11.2021 | Appeal received No. T2019/21 | 17.11.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 31.01.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 12.02.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2015 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | IE | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | LU | 30.11.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0999156 (NEDPACK [NL]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 25 - line 26 * * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]US3844422 (TULL T ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4058225 (JANSON BERNT OWE) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2436727 (LAESSIG FOERDERTECH HAMBURG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US4778323 (SALTS THOMAS R [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0999156 | US3844422 | US4058225 | EP2358617 | Opposition | WO9823511 | US5944479 | EP0999156 | US2004193311 | WO2010059923 | DE102009011294 | DE102009011296 | US2010228385 | EP2450298 | EP2457854 | EP2589469 | DE102012106111 | EP2733090 | - J. van Eekelen, "Load Forming Logic for Load Carrier Loading", Research Disclosure, (20130620), vol. 591, no. 71, XP007142358 | - Vanderlande Industries, "An automated case picking system", Research Disclosure, (201408), vol. 604, no. 006, XP007143313 |