EP3234854 - TECHNIQUE FOR CONTROLLING THE READING OF A DIGITAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states ORANGE 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUVRAY, Vincent 12, rue du Clos St. Jean 50120 Equerderville-Hainneville / FR | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15817475.5 | 04.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015FR53332 | Priority number, date | FR20140062770 | 18.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1462770 | [2017/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016097523 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3234854 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3234854 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F21/35, H04W12/04, H04W12/084 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/1013 (EP,US);
G06F21/35 (EP);
G06F21/62 (US);
H04L63/06 (US);
H04L63/107 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | G06F21/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNIK ZUR STEUERUNG DES LESENS EINES DIGITALEN OBJEKTS | [2017/43] | English: | TECHNIQUE FOR CONTROLLING THE READING OF A DIGITAL OBJECT | [2017/43] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE CONTROLE DE LECTURE D'UN OBJET NUMERIQUE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 28.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2015 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | IE | 04.12.2021 | LU | 04.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
TR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010062743 (JONSSON MATTIAS [SE]); | [I]US2014245393 (WORRALL ERIC [GB], et al) |