EP3218898 - MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PREVENTING PLAYER'S BODY FROM DAMPING VIBRATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relish Brothers AG Industriestrasse 16 6203 Sempach Station / CH | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states Relish Brothers AG Dattenmattstrasse 14 6010 Kriens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜNG, Silvan Diebold-Schilling-Strasse 34 6004 Luzern / CH | 02 /
GIGER, Pirmin Kuonimattstrasse 7 6010 Kriens / CH | [2019/44] |
Former [2017/38] | 01 /
KÜNG, Silvan Diebold-Schilling-Strasse 34 CH-6004 Luzern / CH | ||
02 /
GIGER, Pirmin Kuonimattstrasse 7 CH-6010 Kriens / CH | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 15817546.3 | 13.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015IB58780 | Priority number, date | EP20140193118 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: EP 14193118 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016075664 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3218898 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3218898 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10D1/08, G10D3/18, G10D3/02 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
G10D3/18 (EP,CN,US);
G10D1/085 (EP,CN,US);
G10D3/02 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUSIKINSTRUMENT ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNG DURCH DEN KÖRPER DES SPIELERS | [2017/38] | English: | MUSICAL INSTRUMENT FOR PREVENTING PLAYER'S BODY FROM DAMPING VIBRATIONS | [2017/38] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE PERMETTANT D'EMPÊCHER LE CORPS DU MUSICIEN D'AMORTIR LES VIBRATIONS | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 13.11.2020 | LU | 13.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 13.11.2015 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.11.2015 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 13.11.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4169402 (WOOD NEIL L [US]) [A] 1-13 * columns 1,2; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5939652 (JONES ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-13 * columns 1-5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2355574 (NEWBERRY VICTOR GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1-13 * pages 1-4,7-13; figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]US2003121393 (BROWN KEVIN [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0009] - [0012] - [0014] , [0015] , [0028] - [0031]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2005211052 (GIGLIOTTI PATRICK J [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] - [0027]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US2008053288 (BRUNKALLA MARTIN FRANK [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0036] - [0043]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2008127800 (KOENTOPP DAN [US]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0030] - [0038] - [0044] - [0047] - [0056] , [0060] , [0063] , [0073]; figures 1,2,5,6,11 *; | [A] - Bart, "Floating Soundboards", (20100403), URL: http://windworld.com/tools-techniques-ideas/floating-soundboards/, (20160229), XP055253904 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6459024 | US6646189 | US2008202310 | US2009320666 | US7863507 |