EP3209568 - A STERILIZATION PACKAGING, A METHOD FOR PACKAGING A PRODUCT THEREIN, AND A METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF A PRODUCT FROM SAID PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipak B.V. Nieuwstadterweg 17 6136 KN Sittard / NL | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIKMAN, Jouni Matias Wipaktie 2 15560 Nastola / FI | 02 /
MUHONEN, Paavo Petteri Wipaktie 2 15560 Nastola / FI | 03 /
NIEBER, Kai Ricarda-Huch-Strasse 10 29664 Walsrode / DE | 04 /
TERWOLBECK, Michaël Stephanus Nieuwstadterweg 17 6136 KN Sittard / NL | [2019/39] |
Former [2017/35] | 01 /
VIKMAN, Jouni Matias Wipaktie 2 FI-15560 Nastola / FI | ||
02 /
MUHONEN, Paavo Petteri Wipaktie 2 FI-15560 Nastola / FI | |||
03 /
NIEBER, Kai Bahnhofstrasse 13 29699 Bomlitz / DE | |||
04 /
TERWOLBECK, Michaël Stephanus Nieuwstadterweg 17 NL-6136 KN Sittard / NL | Representative(s) | Plaggenborg, Menko Bernard Octrooibureau Novopatent Transistorstraat 31, Office 02-18 1322 CK Almere / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Plaggenborg, Menko Bernard Octrooibureau Novopatent Top Tower, 6th Floor Busplein 36 1315 KV Almere / NL | Application number, filing date | 15818096.8 | 22.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015NL50734 | Priority number, date | NL20142013669 | 23.10.2014 Original published format: NL 2013669 | [2017/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016064274 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3209568 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3209568 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/30, B65D75/56, B65D81/20, B65D81/26, B65B7/02, B65B55/02, A61L2/08, A61L2/20, B65B55/16 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
B65B55/02 (EP,US);
B65B55/16 (US);
A61L2/081 (EP,US);
A61L2/206 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (US);
B65B55/18 (US);
B65B7/02 (US);
B65D75/30 (US);
B65D75/566 (EP,US);
B65D75/5855 (EP,US);
B65D81/2084 (EP,US);
B65D81/263 (EP,US);
A61L2202/181 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | B65B55/02, B65D75/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STERILISIERBARE VERPACKUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM DARIN VERPACKEN EINES PRODUKTS, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM ENTNEHMEN EINES PRODUKTS AUS DIESER VERPACKUNG | [2018/23] | English: | A STERILIZATION PACKAGING, A METHOD FOR PACKAGING A PRODUCT THEREIN, AND A METHOD FOR THE REMOVAL OF A PRODUCT FROM SAID PACKAGING | [2017/35] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE STÉRILISATION, PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'EMBALLER UN PRODUIT À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CELUI-CI, ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE RETIRER UN PRODUIT DUDIT EMBALLAGE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/35] | STERILISIERUNGSVERPACKUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR VERPACKUNG EINES PRODUKTES DARIN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG EINES PRODUKTS AUS BESAGTER VERPACKUNG | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2015 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | LU | 22.10.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.10.2015 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.10.2015 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.10.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3768725 (PILARO J) [A] 1,11,14* the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1550466 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12,14,17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 3A,3B * [Y] 5,6,10,11,15 [I] 16; | [IY]JP2010268967 (OKADA SHIGYO KK) [I] 1,13 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,10; | [Y]US2011211991 (FOLTZ WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0060]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2013203576 (DAUGHTRY ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * |