EP3166415 - ENRICHMENT OF PALMITOLEIC ACID PALMITOLEIC ACID DERIVATIVES BY DRY AND SOLVENT-AIDED WINTERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omega Protein Corporation 2105 City West Boulevard Suite 500 Houston, TX 77042-2838 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYELASHOV, Oleksandr, A. 26443 Sundown Cove Lane Katy, TX 77494 / US | 02 /
YIN, Huaixia 13707 Rockhill Point Drive Cypress, TX 77429 / US | 03 /
LI, Juan 12613 Seattle Slew Drive Apt. 3725 Houston, TX 77065 / US | 04 /
GRIFFIN, Mark 30625 Quinn Road Tomball, TX 77375 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | O'Neill, Michelle Harrison IP Westminster Business Centre 10 Great North Way Nether Poppleton York YO26 6RB / GB | Application number, filing date | 15818846.6 | 08.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015US39607 | Priority number, date | US201462022120P | 08.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462022120 P | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016007670 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166415 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/00, A61K31/201, C11B7/00, A23D9/04 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
C11B7/0025 (EP,US);
A23D9/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/201 (EP,US);
C11B7/0016 (EP,US);
C11B7/0075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A23D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | ANREICHERUNG VON PALMITOLEINSÄUREDERIVATEN DURCH TROCKENE UND LÖSUNGSMITTELUNTERSTÜTZTE WINTERISIERUNG | [2017/20] | English: | ENRICHMENT OF PALMITOLEIC ACID PALMITOLEIC ACID DERIVATIVES BY DRY AND SOLVENT-AIDED WINTERIZATION | [2017/20] | French: | ENRICHISSEMENT D'ACIDE PALMITOLÉIQUE ET DE DÉRIVÉS D'ACIDE PALMITOLÉIQUE PAR WINTÉRISATION PAR VOIE SÈCHE ET ASSISTÉE PAR SOLVANT | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 02.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012225941 (GREEN JEFFREY [US]) [X] 1,22 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0247]; examples 1-2; tables I-V * [I] 2-21; | [AD]JPH01187089 (SHIKIBO LTD) [AD] 1-22 * page 515, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 5 * | [A] - LUIS-FELIPE GUTIÉRREZA & KHALED BELKACEMIA, "Palmitoleic Acid Enrichment of Seabuckthorn (Hippophaë rhamnoides L.) Pulp Oil by Crystallization Process", SEPARATION SCIENCE AND TECHNO,, (20080101), vol. 43, no. 8, doi:10.1080/01496390802064091, ISSN 0149-6395, pages 2003 - 2022, XP009177990 [A] 1-22 * Abstract; p. 2006; p. 2010; Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01496390802064091 | International search | [X]US2013129775 (HELIAE DEVELOPMENT, LLC) [X] 1-3 * See abstract; paragraphs [0044], [0046], [0052]; and Fig. 5. *; | [A]WO2013086243 (OMEGA PROTEIN CORPORATION) [A] 1-3 * See abstract; and claims 1-14. *; | [A]US2001005519 (CAIN, F. W. et al.) [A] 1-3 * See abstract, and claims 1-14. *; | [A]JPH01187089 (SHIKISHIMA BOSEKI KK) [A] 1-3 * See abstract. *; | [A]US2838480 (SWERN, D. et al.) [A] 1-3 * See claims 1-3. * |