EP3166499 - PORTABLE ULTRASOUND USER INTERFACE AND RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edan Instruments, Inc. 3/F - B, Nanshan Medical Equipments Park Nanhai Rd 1019 Shekou Nanshan, Shenzhen 518067 / CN | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Sean c/o Edan USA 1200 Crossman Ave. Suite 200 Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
MCCABE, Larry c/o Edan USA 1200 Crossman Ave. Suite 200 Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
HENDERSON, Richard c/o Edan USA 1200 Crossman Ave. Suite 200 Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 15818872.2 | 08.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015US39610 | Priority number, date | US201462022613P | 09.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462022613 P | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016007673 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3166499 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/462 (US);
A61B8/06 (US);
A61B8/4427 (EP,US);
A61B8/461 (CN);
A61B8/465 (CN);
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B8/52 (CN,US);
G01S7/52084 (EP,US);
G06F1/1615 (EP,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (CN,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/04845 (CN,US);
G06F3/04847 (CN);
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
A61B8/468 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ULTRASCHALLBENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE UND RESSOURCENVERWALTUNGSSYSTEME SOWIE VERFAHREN | [2017/20] | English: | PORTABLE ULTRASOUND USER INTERFACE AND RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2017/20] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE SYSTÈME À ULTRASONS PORTABLE, ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 31.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002173721 (GRUNWALD SORIN [US], et al) [A] 9,10* paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0283] *; | [XYI]US2008119731 (BECERRA CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 2A,2B,3A,3B, * [Y] 6 [I] 5,9,10,13-15; | [X]US2008125655 (SONG YOUNG SEUK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2013148730 (TERATECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figures 3I-3J * * page 13, line 25 - page 14, line 21 *; | [A]US2013324850 (PETRUZZELLI JOE [US], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0027] * * figure 8 * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0049] *; | [XI]US2014088428 (YANG EUN-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8,12 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0141] * * figures 5A-5C,6,1C * * paragraph [0131] * [I] 5,9,10,13-15 | International search | [A]US6491630 (SACCARDO GRACE M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]WO2006111874 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2008055826 (SMITH SCOTT F [US], et al) [X] 1-8 and 13-19 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1-2 and 12; para [0014], [0049]-[0051], [0058], [0064], [0089]-[0102], and [0117]-[0118] * [A] 9-12 and 20; | [A]US2008119731 (BECERRA CARLOS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008146922 (STEINS ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2013197364 (HAN KI-WOOK [KR]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2014098049 (KOCH AXEL [US], et al) [A] 9 and 19-20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1; para [0013] and [0032] *; | [A]US2014121524 (CHIANG ALICE M [US], et al) [A] 19-20* , entire document * | by applicant | US2008119731 | US2008125655 | WO2013148730 | US2014088428 |