EP3167830 - LOCKING PLATE SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF FRACTURE OF DISTAL RADIUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokai National Higher Education and Research System 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3 Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2020/34] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Fo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3 Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRATA Hitoshi c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 02 /
HARA Tatsuya c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 03 /
YONEDA Hidemasa c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 04 /
BANDOH Shunichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha B. I. TEC 125 Nakaoida-cho Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 504-0109 / JP | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15818952.2 | 09.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015JP69756 | Priority number, date | JP20140141511 | 09.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014141511 | [2017/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016006653 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167830 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167830 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/68, A61B17/80, A61B17/86 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/8028 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (US);
A61B17/8605 (US);
A61B17/8625 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A61B17/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSPLATTENSYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FRAKTUR DES DISTALEN RADIUS | [2017/20] | English: | LOCKING PLATE SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF FRACTURE OF DISTAL RADIUS | [2017/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PLAQUE DE VERROUILLAGE POUR TRAITEMENT DE FRACTURE DE L'EXTRÉMITÉ DISTALE DU RADIUS | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2017 | Translation filed | 09.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2015 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 09.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 09.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6712820 (ORBAY JORGE L [US]) [A] 1,4-8,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004260291 (JENSEN DAVID G [US]) [X] 1,4-7,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] - [0045] - [0080]; figures 1,5-13 *; | [A]GB2405342 (BIOMET MERCK LTD [GB]) [A] 2,11* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2009048605 (YUREK MATTHEW T [US]) [X] 1,4-8,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0037] - [0041] - [0050]; figures 1,4,5,18,19 * [Y] 2,3,9-13 [I] 14; | [Y]US2011218570 (FELIX BRENT A [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,9-13 * paragraphs [0038] - [0053]; figures 1-4,6-12,16 *; | [Y]US2012059376 (RAINS JAMES K [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,9-13 * paragraphs [0097] , [0098] , [0119] , [0134] - [0137]; figures 4-9,31-36 *; | [XI]US2014066998 (MARTIN JEAN-JACQUES [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,14 * paragraphs [0047] - [0058] - [0065] - [0067]; figures 1-10,21-23 * [I] 15; | [A]WO2014072983 (CARBOFIX ORTHOPEDICS LTD [IL]) [A] 2,3,9-13 * paragraphs [0109] - [0131] - [0134] - [0159] - [0198] - [0200] - [0248]; figures 1-8,10-16 * | International search | [Y]JP2003512125 (Sepitec Foundation) [Y] 20-21* , paragraphs [0019], [0022] & US 6786909 B1 & WO 2001/030251 A1 & DE 19951760 A1 & CA 2388854 A1 *; | [Y]WO2007010671 (M E SYSTEM KK [JP], et al) [Y] 16 * , paragraphs [0057] to [0061]; fig. 14 to 16 & JP 2007-21001 A *; | [Y]JP2007083046 (HAND INNOVATIONS LLC) [Y] 5, 8-9 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0035]; fig. 7 to 8 & US 2006/0009771 A1 & EP 1764052 A1 & DE 602006003706 D1 *; | [Y]JP2009527261 (Biodynamics, L.L.C.) [Y] 13 * , paragraphs [0007], [0022], [0046] to [0047], [0052]; fig. 11 & WO 2007/086832 A2 & CA 2635486 A1 *; | [Y]JP2010522019 (The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill) [Y] 10 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0020]; fig. 2B & US 2008/0234677 A1 & US 2008/0234752 A1 & US 2015/0112355 A1 & WO 2008/115318 A1 & WO 2008/156597 A1 & CA 2681334 A1 & CN 101772329 A *; | [Y]JP2012505723 (Smith & Nephew, Inc.) [Y] 1-24 * , paragraphs [0060], [0068] to [0069], [0090], [0107] to [0108], [0112]; fig. 4 to 5, 33 to 34, 38 & US 2012/0059376 A1 & WO 2010/045473 A2 & CA 2740730 A1 & CN 102245115 A *; | [Y]US2013184765 (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al) [Y] 1-24 * , paragraphs [0057] to [0157]; fig. 1 to 13 & EP 2614787 A1 * | Examination | EP2623057 |