EP3168910 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Jeong Ae LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 02 /
CHI, Han Na LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Sung Soo LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | 04 /
KWON, Su Jee LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-738 / KR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2017/20] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15819055.3 | 09.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015KR07125 | Priority number, date | KR20140087364 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140087364 | KR20140153838 | 06.11.2014 Original published format: KR 20140153838 | KR20140153839 | 06.11.2014 Original published format: KR 20140153839 | [2017/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016006945 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168910 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3168910 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/131, H01M10/0567, C09D5/24, C09D133/20, C09D133/24, H01M4/505, H01M4/04, H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/1391, H01M4/485, H01M4/525, H01M4/66, H01M4/02, C09D7/61 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D133/20 (US);
C09D133/24 (US);
C09D5/24 (US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/13 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (US);
H01M4/139 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M4/485 (US);
H01M4/505 (US);
H01M4/525 (US);
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
H01M4/622 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/02, H01M4/66, H01M4/525, H01M4/485, H01M4/1391, H01M4/04, H01M4/131, H01M10/0567, C09D5/24, C09D7/12, C09D133/20, C09D133/24, H01M4/505 | ||
Former IPC [2017/20] | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M4/139 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/20] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2017/20] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2016 | Translation filed | 25.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 25.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2015 | AL | 11.09.2019 | AT | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.07.2015 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010055564 (TOKUNAGA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10-12,14-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0091]; claims 5-7 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]WO2010098380 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2012043812 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12,14-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092]; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US2012183848 (KANG MINAH [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] ** paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]US2013202963 (KIM OK SUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-16,22 * paragraph [0075]; table 1 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0031] * | International search | [A]KR100560533B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [A] 1-22* See abstract; page 3; example 4. *; | [A]JP2008123824 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-22 * See abstract; claims 1 and 3; paragraphs [0017] and [0033]-[0036]. *; | [A]KR20090046700 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1 and 4; paragraphs [0066]-[0073], [0141]-[0143] and [0154]-[0155]; table 1. *; | [A]JP2010097816 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-22 * See abstract; claims 1-4; examples 1-9; table 4. *; | [XA]KR20130135092 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1, 8-16, 22 * See claims 1, 12 and 23; paragraphs [0045] and [0053]-[0054]; examples 1-2 . * [A] 2-7, 17-21 |