EP3167807 - PORTABLE ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING POWER EFFICIENCY OF SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/20] | PORTABLE ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND POWER EFFICIENCY IMPROVEMENT METHOD THEREIN | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Healcerion Co. Ltd. 509ho, Seoul Business Consulting Center 72, Digital-ro 26-gil, Guro-gu Seoul 152-848 / KR | [2019/19] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Healcerion Co. Ltd. 509ho, Seoul Business Consulting Center 72, Digital-ro 26-gil, Guro-gu Seoul 152-848 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Jeong Won 302-101 LH 3rd Apt. 34 Yangjae-daero 2-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-140 / KR | 02 /
CHOUNG, You Chan 101-1405 47 Seooreung-ro 21-gil Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-807 / KR | 03 /
CHUNG, Wook Jin 401-903 33 Hakdong-ro 73-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-950 / KR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2017/20] | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15819187.4 | 13.03.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015KR02450 | Priority number, date | KR20140085249 | 08.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140085249 | [2017/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016006790 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167807 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167807 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
A61B8/4427 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP);
A61B8/14 (US);
A61B8/4483 (US);
A61B8/56 (EP,US);
A61B8/585 (EP);
A61B8/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A61B8/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES DIAGNOSTISCHE ULTRASCHALLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ENERGIEEFFIZIENZ EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2018/50] | English: | PORTABLE ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD OF IMPROVING POWER EFFICIENCY OF SUCH A DEVICE | [2018/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR ULTRASONS ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE L'EFFICACITÉ ÉNERGÉTIQUE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2018/50] |
Former [2017/20] | TRAGBARES DIAGNOSTISCHE ULTRASCHALLVORRICHTUNG UND KRAFTSTOFFEFFIZIENZVERBESSERUNGSVERFAHREN DARIN | ||
Former [2017/20] | PORTABLE ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND POWER EFFICIENCY IMPROVEMENT METHOD THEREIN | ||
Former [2017/20] | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR ULTRASONS ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU RENDEMENT DE PUISSANCE EN SON SEIN | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2017 | Translation filed | 10.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 10.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2015 | AL | 08.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 13.03.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 13.03.2015 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2005312587 (ALOKA CO LTD) [I] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]KR20090111552 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011077517 (SATOU YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0007] , [0 30] , [0 51] - [0052] - [0059] - [0061] *; | [Y]WO2014003404 (HEALCERION CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH07236640 (TOSHIBA MEDICAL ENG, et al) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0017]-[0024], claim 1, figure 4. *; | [Y]JP2006141465 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0007]-[0011], [0037]-[0038], figures 3-4. *; | [A]JP2007275354 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0054]-[0055], [0078]-[0080], claim 1, figure 5. *; | [Y]KR20090111552 (MEDISON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraphs [0020]-[0026], claims 1, 4, figures 2-3. * |