EP3167049 - MICRONIZED WHARTON'S JELLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIMEDX Group Inc. 1775 West Oak Commons Ct. NE Marietta, GA 30062 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Randall c/o MiMedx Group Inc. 1775 West Oak Commons Ct. N.E. Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | 02 /
SITH, Somaly c/o MiMedx Group Inc. 1775 West Oak Commons Ct. N.E. Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | 03 /
KOOB, Thomas c/o MiMedx Group Inc. 1775 West Oak Commons Ct. N.E. Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Gibson, Mark Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15819525.5 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015US39444 | Priority number, date | US201462022084P | 08.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462022084 P | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016007554 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167049 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/51, A61L27/38, A61K9/00, C12N5/073, A61L27/36, A61K9/14 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
A61K35/51 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | C12N5/073, A61K35/50, A61L27/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | 26.01.2017 | ME | 26.01.2017 | Title | German: | MIKRONISIERTE WHARTON-SULZE | [2017/20] | English: | MICRONIZED WHARTON'S JELLY | [2017/20] | French: | GELÉE DE WHARTON MICRONISÉE | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014050788 (DANIEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0068] * [I] 3-15; | [E]WO2015179711 (MIMEDX GROUP INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * claims 1-15 *; | [A] - ELENA STOCCO ET AL, "Tailored PVA/ECM Scaffolds for Cartilage Regeneration", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20140101), vol. 2014, doi:10.1155/2014/762189, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 12, XP055416923 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Culture media and reagents; page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/762189 | International search | [X]US2014017280 (DANIEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-11, 24, 29 * , para [0009]-[0010], [0049], [0059]-[0060], [0077] *; | [X]US2014052247 (DANIEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-11, 24 * , para [0072], [0088]-[0090] [0094], [0103]-[0105] *; | [XP]US2015064274 (KOOB THOMAS J [US]) [XP] 1-2, 4-11, 24 * , para [0011], ], [0035]-[0036], [0070], [0088], [001 [01061 * |