EP3167932 - DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF A TISSUE BY MEANS OF LASER RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERMEDIC ARFRAN, S.A. Parc Tecnologic del Vallès C/ Boter, 8-10 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès / ES | [2019/02] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states INTERMEDIC ARFRAN, S.A. Parc Tecnològic del Vallès C/ Boter, 8-10 08290 Cerdanyola / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCUSA VILLACAMPA, Francisco Javier c/o Intermedic Arfran, S.A. Parc Tecnologic del Vallès C/ Boter 8-10 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | [2019/03] |
Former [2019/01] | 01 /
ARCUSA VILLACAMPA, Francisco Javier c/o Intermedic Arfran S.A. Parc Tecnologic del Vallès C/ Boter 8-10 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | ||
Former [2017/20] | 01 /
ARCUSA VILLACAMPA, Francisco Javier c/o Intermedic Arfran S.A. Parc Tecnologic del Vallés C/ Boter 8-10 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallés (Barcelona) / ES | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2017/20] | Oficina Ponti, SLP C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 15819640.2 | 01.04.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015ES70265 | Priority number, date | ES20140031053 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: ES 201431053 | [2017/20] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005622 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167932 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167932 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/067, A61B18/20, A61N5/06, // A61B18/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
A61B18/20 (EP);
A61N5/0603 (ES);
A61B18/201 (EP);
A61B2018/00523 (EP);
A61B2018/00559 (EP);
A61B2018/20553 (EP);
A61N2005/0611 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A61N5/067, A61B18/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE MITTELS LASERSTRAHLUNG | [2018/50] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF A TISSUE BY MEANS OF LASER RADIATION | [2017/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN TISSU PAR RAYONNEMENT LASER | [2017/20] |
Former [2017/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE MITTELS LASERSTRAHLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | Translation filed | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2015 | AL | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | HR | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MK | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | RS | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | SM | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 01.04.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 01.04.2015 | |
AL | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
MT | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
SM | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
HR | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
RS | 22.05.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 22.05.2019 | |
LT | 22.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011096006 (EL EN SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-7* page 5; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]WO2012092508 (CERAMOPTEC IND INC [US], et al) [A] 1* , abstract *; | [A]EP2476460 (FOTONA D D [SI]) [A] 1-7 * , claim 1, 11,12; figures 5 - 9, paragraphs[49 - 52]; paragraphs[54 - 60]; *; | [A]CN203195763U (CHONGQING DEMA PHOTOELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , abstract *; | [A]KR101363550B (UNION MEDICAL ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * , abstract; figures 1 - 3,5,7 - 9. *; | [A]KR101406871B (SENBITEC [KR]) [A] 1-7 * , figures 1,2,3a,3b,4 * |