01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
21.06.2019 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
17.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
13.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
21.12.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
06.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
07.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
17.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|