Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017103651 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9971707 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2018 | B2 | US2017364455 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615162288 | 23.05.2016 | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | US201715691874 | 31.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9779034 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2017168963 | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11210239 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2021 | B2 | US2020151115 | 14.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615162288 | 23.05.2016 | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | US201815949312 | 10.04.2018 | US201715691874 | 31.08.2017 | US202016741905 | 14.01.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10552346 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2020 | B2 | US2018232319 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615162288 | 23.05.2016 | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | US201815949312 | 10.04.2018 | US201715691874 | 31.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6518015B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | B2 | JP2018538630 | 27.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3584708 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2022 | B1 | EP3584708 | 25.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | EP19180770 | 15.12.2015 | EP15820283 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3005949 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2022 | C | CA3005949 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015417223B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | B2 | AU2015417223 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3204861 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | EP3204861 | 16.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3204861T | 31.12.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | EP15820283 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3584708T | 26.09.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | EP19180770 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3204861T | 19.09.2019 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | EP15820283 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3584708T | 27.07.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | EP19180770 | 15.12.2015 | EP15820283 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201804301U | 28.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015IB59646 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Divisional application | EP3584708 |