14.12.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
01.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
15.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2017 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
23.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
23.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
22.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
30.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
30.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|