Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3196255 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | A4 | EP3196255 | 26.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015CN83496 | 07.07.2015 | CN201410330290 | 12.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016008371 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410330290 | 12.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105238080 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201410330290 | 12.07.2014 |