EP3196255 - REACTIVE MODIFIED ASPHALT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangxi Golden Umbrella Waterproofing Co. Ltd. No.4 Unit 1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning, Guangxi 530001 / CN | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Guicai No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi530001 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Fangwu No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi 530001 / CN | 03 /
WU, Shengjiang No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi 530001 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Wenxiong No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi 530001 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Libin No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi 530001 / CN | 06 /
LU, Shanqing No.4 Unit1 Building No.1 Near No.18 Sunshine Greentown, Jingguan Road Donggou Ridge, Xingning District Nanning Guangxi 530001 / CN | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15821354.6 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015CN83496 | Priority number, date | CN201410330290 | 12.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410330290 | [2017/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008371 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196255 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L53/02, C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L9/02, C08L7/00, C08L19/00, C08L97/00, C08K5/10, C08K5/57, C08K5/521, C08K5/098, C08K5/5415, C08K5/5419, C08K5/5435, E04D5/02, D06N5/00 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C08L97/005 (EP);
C08H6/00 (EP);
D06N5/003 (EP);
C08L95/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/005, C08L9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | REAKTIVER MODIFIZIERTER ASPHALT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/30] | English: | REACTIVE MODIFIED ASPHALT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2017/30] | French: | ASPHALTE MODIFIÉ RÉACTIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2017 | Translation filed | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/30] | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 06.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/03] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 31.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0604258 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION [FR]) [I] 1-14 * example 1 *; | [I]WO0153409 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION [FR], et al) [I] 1-14 * example 3 *; | [I]CN103304862 (GUANGXI GOLDEN UMBRELLA WATERPROOFER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]CN103525108 (BEIJING TONGHUA ROAD MAINTENANCE CO LTD) [I] 1-14* example 3 *; | [I]CN103788668 (UNIV CHANGSHA SCIENCE) [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101694114 (GUANGXI GOLDEN UMBRELLA WATERP) [A] 1-14 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN102220023 (GUANGXI GOLDEN UMBRELLA WATERPROOFING CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , see the whole document *; | [A]US2013096240 (FLANIGAN THEODORE P [US]) [A] 1-14* , see the whole document *; | [X]CN103304862 (GUANGXI GOLDEN UMBRELLA WATERPROOFER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 11-12, 14 * , see description, embodiment 2, and page 2, paragraph [0008] *; | [X]CN103788668 (UNIV CHANGSHA SCIENCE) [X] 1-4, 11-12 * , see description, paragraph [0029] * |