EP3129980 - NEAR-EYE DISPLAY WITH SELF-EMITTING MICRODISPLAY ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vuzix Corporation 25 Hendrix Road, Suite A West Henrietta, New York 14586 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAVERS, Paul J. 91 Boughton Hill Road Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15821529.3 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US40928 | Priority number, date | US201462026373P | 18.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462026373 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016011367 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3129980 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3129980 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/10, G02C7/10, G02B27/01 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G02B27/01 (US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B6/00 (US);
G02B6/0001 (US);
G02B6/0016 (US);
G02B6/0035 (US);
G02C7/10 (US);
G06T19/006 (US);
H04N13/332 (US);
G02B2027/0118 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0178 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0187 (EP,US);
G02B27/0081 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | G09G5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGE IN DER NÄHE DES AUGES MIT SELBSTEMITTIERENDEM MIKROANZEIGENMOTOR | [2017/07] | English: | NEAR-EYE DISPLAY WITH SELF-EMITTING MICRODISPLAY ENGINE | [2017/07] | French: | AFFICHAGE PROCHE DE L'OEIL AVEC MOTEUR DE MICRO-AFFICHAGE À AUTO-ÉMISSION | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 08.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2015 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | IT | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.07.2015 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011096401 (LEVOLA TAPANI [FI]) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0073]; figures 4b,1a,5 *; | [X]US2013114043 (BALAN ALEXANDRU O [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083]; figures 3C,2 * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0091] * * figures 1F,1G *; | [Y]US2014160014 (DOMINICI JOHANNA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0021] , [0027]; figures 1,2,3,4 * * paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0029] * | International search | [A]US2010002154 (HUA HONG [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [X]US2011221793 (KING III ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2012154277 (BAR-ZEEV AVI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013114043 (BALAN ALEXANDRU O [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document * | Examination | US2013042296 | US2013063486 |