EP3171397 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING QUALITY OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM AND LAMINATED BODY HAVING PROTECTIVE FILM ON SURFACE OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM, AND METHOD FOR MANAGING QUALITY OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Nobuyuki c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Kazushi c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 03 /
KUGIMIYA, Toshihiro c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | 04 /
OCHI, Mototaka c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/21] | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Nobuyuki c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Tabatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | ||
02 /
HAYASHI, Kazushi c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Tabatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
03 /
KUGIMIYA, Toshihiro c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Tabatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | |||
04 /
OCHI, Mototaka c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Tabatsukadai 1-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15822449.3 | 06.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015JP69387 | Priority number, date | JP20140146337 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014146337 | [2017/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009868 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3171397 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3171397 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/265, H01L29/66, H01L21/66, H01L29/786, H01L27/146 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
H01L22/12 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/2656 (EP,US);
H01L22/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01L22/20 (KR);
H01L29/66969 (EP,US);
H01L29/7869 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | H01L21/66, H01L21/336, H01L29/786 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER QUALITÄT EINER OXIDHALBLEITERDÜNNSCHICHT UND LAMINIERTER KÖRPER MIT EINEM SCHUTZFILM AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINER OXIDHALBLEITERDÜNNSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DER QUALITÄT EINER OXIDHALBLEITERDÜNNSCHICHT | [2017/21] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING QUALITY OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM AND LAMINATED BODY HAVING PROTECTIVE FILM ON SURFACE OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM, AND METHOD FOR MANAGING QUALITY OF OXIDE SEMICONDUCTOR THIN FILM | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ D'UN FILM MINCE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR D'OXYDE ET D'UN CORPS STRATIFIÉ AYANT UN FILM PROTECTEUR SUR LA SURFACE D'UN FILM MINCE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR D'OXYDE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE LA QUALITÉ D'UN FILM MINCE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR D'OXYDE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2016 | Translation filed | 08.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 08.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP18205189.6 / EP3462196 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2012033857 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 8,9* paragraph [0061]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2013168575 (UNIV TOKYO, et al) [Y] 2,5-7 * paragraph [0133]; figure 6 *; | [IY]JP2013254948 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [I] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0007] , [0053] , [0151] * [Y] 2,5-9 | International search | [A]JP2002098634 (TOCHIGI NIKON CORP, et al) [A] 1-14* , entire text; all drawings & US 2001/0029436 A1 & TW 571106 B & KR 10-2001-0091010 A *; | [A]JP2011054863 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0058155 A1 *; | [A]JP2011249788 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0269266 A1 & WO 2011/135987 A1 & TW 201205684 A *; | [A]JP2012033857 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 102313849 A & KR 10-2012-0002459 A & TW 201226892 A *; | [A]JP2013168575 (UNIV TOKYO, et al) [A] 1-14 * , paragraphs [0133] to [0135] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013254948 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0091000 A1 & WO 2013/168748 A1 & CN 104272463 A & KR 10-2015-0005591 A & TW 201409718 A * |