EP3169356 - RECOMBINANT LISTERIA STRAIN EXPRESSING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIGEN FUSION PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advaxis, Inc. 305 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010-3000 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLECHA, Anu 201 Wildflower Circle Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 02 /
PETIT, Robert 149 Parsons Lane Newtown (Wrightstown), Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 03 /
ELLENHORN, Joshua 236 S. Linden Drive Beverly Hills, California 90212 / US | 04 /
DIAMOND, Don J. 415 North Elwood Avenue Glendora, California 91741 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15822487.3 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US40911 | Priority number, date | US201462026085P | 18.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462026085 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011353 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169356 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K35/74, A61K39/12, A61P35/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/4748 (KR);
A61K39/00115 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/385 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (US);
C07K14/4703 (US);
C12N15/74 (KR);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12Y501/01001 (EP,US);
A61K2039/52 (KR);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (KR);
A61K2039/572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (US);
C07K2319/00 (KR);
C07K2319/40 (US);
C07K2319/55 (US);
C12N2800/107 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | A61K39/02, A61K35/74, A61K39/12, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | 20.01.2017 | ME | 20.01.2017 | Validation states | MA | 20.01.2017 | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTER LISTERIASTAMM ZUR EXPRESSION VON HETEROLOGEN ANTIGENFUSIONSPROTEINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/21] | English: | RECOMBINANT LISTERIA STRAIN EXPRESSING HETEROLOGOUS ANTIGEN FUSION PROTEINS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2017/21] | French: | SOUCHE DE LISTERIA RECOMBINÉE EXPRIMANT DES PROTÉINES DE FUSION À ANTIGÈNE HÉTÉROLOGUES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LES UTILISER | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011100754 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) | International search | [Y]CN1763093 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH [CN]); | [Y]US2011129499 (MACIAG PAULO [US], et al) |