EP3171327 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD FOR GENERATING CONTROL SIGNAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI Takashi c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA Kensuke c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
OSHIKIRI Kohji c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
DENDA Takeshi c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMURA Shohei c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
TOMII Yasuhiro c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
YAMANAKA Yuji c/o RICOH COMPANY LTD. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15822857.7 | 10.06.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015JP66773 | Priority number, date | JP20140146161 | 16.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014146161 | JP20150005745 | 15.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015005745 | [2017/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009752 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3171327 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/02, A01G9/24, G01J3/46 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
H05B45/12 (EP,US);
A01G7/00 (EP,US);
A01G9/24 (EP,US);
A01G9/247 (US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/0264 (EP,US);
G01J3/027 (EP,US);
G01J3/0278 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01J3/46 (US);
G01N21/21 (EP,US);
G01N21/251 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06Q50/02 (EP,US);
G06V20/188 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES KONTROLLSIGNALS, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM | [2017/21] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD FOR GENERATING CONTROL SIGNAL, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2017/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UN SIGNAL DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2017 | Translation filed | 04.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 04.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010115830 (DUBE SYLVAIN [SE]) [X] 1-3,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 83] - [0089] * [I] 4-11,13; | [A]WO2013059399 (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0039] - [0044] *; | [XI]US2013217439 (ULMAN MORRISON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0025] * [I] 3-11,13 | International search | [Y]JPH08112021 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [Y] 11* , paragraph [0001] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004177369 (JENESHIA KK) [Y] 3, 6 * , paragraph [0007] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005291910 (JAPAN AEROSPACE EXPLORATION) [Y] 6 * , paragraph [0001] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006333744 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 7, 8 * , paragraphs [0058], [0095] to [0098] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013231645 (ITO EN LTD, et al) [Y] 2, 4-6 * , paragraphs [0014], [0026], [0066] (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2014103958 (DAIWA HOUSE IND) [X] 1, 9, 12-14 * , paragraphs [0062] to [0067] (Family: none) * [Y] 2-8, 11 [A] 10 |