EP3233332 - METAL INJECTION NOZZLE FOR INJECTION MOLDING A LIQUID METAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Krallmann GmbH Siemensstrasse 17 - 19 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREXELER, Ingo Am Zamelsberg 50 58300 Wetter Ruhr / DE | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15822909.6 | 15.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP02518 | Priority number, date | DE20141018793 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014018793 | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096121 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233332 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3233332 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/20, C03B7/09, B29C45/20, B29C45/22 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B22D17/2023 (EP);
B22D17/2038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLSPRITZDÜSE ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN EINER FLÜSSIGEN METALL-KOMPONENTE | [2019/38] | English: | METAL INJECTION NOZZLE FOR INJECTION MOLDING A LIQUID METAL COMPONENT | [2017/43] | French: | BUSE D'INJECTION DE MÉTAL POUR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION D'UN COMPOSANT MÉTAL LIQUIDE | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/43] | METALLSPRITZDÜSE ZUM SPRITZGIEßEN EINER FLÜSSIGEN METALL-KOMPONENTE | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 17.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2015 | AL | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | IT | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.12.2015 | |
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3568256 (JOHNSON CLIFFORD DAVID JR) [X] 1,3-5,9 * abstract * [Y] 2,6-10; | [A]DE2338458 (HEHL KARL) [A] 2* abstract *; | [XY]DE69510751T (HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING [CA]) [X] 1,3-5,9 * page 6, lines 3-8, 15-19; figures 2, 7 * [Y] 2,6-10; | [YD]DE102012009790 (KRALLMANN GMBH GEB [DE]) [YD] 2,6-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102012009790 |