EP3242170 - PROMPT INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiaomi Inc. Floor 13, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Changbing Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Hao Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
HOU, Enxing Floor 13 Rainbow City Shopping Mall of China Resources No. 68 Qinghe Middle Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 15823123.3 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015CN93905 | Priority number, date | CN201410836852 | 29.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410836852 | [2017/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016107285 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242170 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3242170 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,KR,RU);
G05B2219/2614 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIREKTE INFORMATIONSSENDUNG | [2017/45] | English: | PROMPT INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS D'INVITE | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | Translation filed | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 25.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 17.03.2021 | AT | 17.03.2021 | CY | 17.03.2021 | CZ | 17.03.2021 | DK | 17.03.2021 | EE | 17.03.2021 | ES | 17.03.2021 | FI | 17.03.2021 | HR | 17.03.2021 | IT | 17.03.2021 | LT | 17.03.2021 | LV | 17.03.2021 | MC | 17.03.2021 | MK | 17.03.2021 | MT | 17.03.2021 | NL | 17.03.2021 | PL | 17.03.2021 | RO | 17.03.2021 | RS | 17.03.2021 | SE | 17.03.2021 | SI | 17.03.2021 | SK | 17.03.2021 | SM | 17.03.2021 | TR | 17.03.2021 | BG | 17.06.2021 | NO | 17.06.2021 | GR | 18.06.2021 | IS | 17.07.2021 | PT | 19.07.2021 | IE | 05.11.2021 | LU | 05.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
TR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
MK | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CY | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 17.03.2021 | ||
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
IE | 05.11.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
MC | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SI | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
DK | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
ES | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.03.2021 | |
AT | 17.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
PL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
IS | 17.07.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RO | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SK | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
PT | 19.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
CZ | 17.03.2021 | ||
EE | 17.03.2021 | ||
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.03.2021 | |
FI | 17.03.2021 | ||
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LT | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
SM | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
NL | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
SE | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
LV | 17.03.2021 | ||
RS | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
BG | 17.06.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
GR | 18.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
HR | 17.03.2021 | ||
NO | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.03.2021 | |
NO | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008186148 (KWON DO-HYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US2008202135 (FRANCIS DANNY LEN [US]); | [A]WO2010140090 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]CN103901850 (SICHUAN CHANGHONG ELECTRIC CO) | International search | [X]CN102117063 (HAIERSOFT CORP); | [A]CN102495617 (SHENZHEN TCL NEW TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN202613686U (CHEN BAOLING); | [A]CN103940031 (SICHUAN CHANGHONG ELECTRIC CO); | [PX]CN104615003 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) |