EP3230972 - COMMERCIAL AND GENERAL AIRCRAFT AVOIDANCE USING LIGHT, SOUND, AND/OR MULTI-SPECTRAL PATTERN DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 81226 Seattle, WA 98108-1226 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHMUELLER, Daniel 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
PACZAN, Nathan, Michael 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109-5210 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Blake, Stephen James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15823242.1 | 11.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US65352 | Priority number, date | US201414569125 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US201414569125 | US201414569233 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US201414569233 | US201414569183 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US201414569183 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016094849 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230972 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230972 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/93, G01S17/93, G05D1/10, G08G5/00, G08G5/04 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G08G5/045 (EP,CN,US);
G01S15/93 (EP);
G01S17/933 (EP);
G05D1/101 (EP,US);
G08G5/0008 (EP,CN);
G08G5/0021 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | G08G5/00, G08G5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMEIDUNG FÜR KOMMERZIELLES UND ALLGEMEINES FLUGZEUG UNTER VERWENDUNG DER DETEKTION VON LICHT, SCHALL UND/ODER MULTISPEKTRALER MUSTER | [2017/42] | English: | COMMERCIAL AND GENERAL AIRCRAFT AVOIDANCE USING LIGHT, SOUND, AND/OR MULTI-SPECTRAL PATTERN DETECTION | [2017/42] | French: | ÉVITEMENT D'AÉRONEFS COMMERCIAUX ET GÉNÉRAUX AU MOYEN D'UNE DÉTECTION DE MOTIF LUMINEUX, SONORE ET/OU MULTISPECTRAL | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 08.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19177711.9 / EP3564927 | EP19177712.7 / EP3567568 | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2015 | AL | 05.02.2020 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | IT | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5581250 (KHVILIVITZKY ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 29 - line 38 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2177966 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * claim 1 ** figure 4 *; | [A]US2011137498 (SUZUKI SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * figure 5 * * claims 1, 5-7 * |