EP3281373 - POSITIONING REFERENCE SYSTEM (PRS) DESIGN ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | 15.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | 15.06.2018 | Change - extension states | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Yang c/o Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard M/S: RNB4-140 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Rui 8F Raycom A No. 2 Kexueyuan South Road Heilongjiang Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Seunghee 1118 Mallard Ridge Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | 04 /
BASHAR, Shafi c/o Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
YIN, Hujun 14315 Springer Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | [2018/10] |
Former [2018/07] | 01 /
TANG, Yang 5752 Owens Drive Apt. 301 Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | ||
02 /
HUANG, Rui 8F Raycom A No. 2 Kexueyuan South Road Heilongjiang Beijing 100085 / CN | |||
03 /
HAN, Seunghee 1118 Mallard Ridge Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | |||
04 /
BASHAR, Shafi c/o Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
05 /
YIN, Hujun 14315 Springer Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 15823468.2 | 18.12.2015 | [2018/07] | WO2015US66740 | Priority number, date | US201562144779P | 08.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144779 P | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164085 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281373 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L5/00, G01S5/10 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04L27/2613 (CN);
G01S5/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04L1/0625 (US);
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DES ENTWURFS EINES POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZSYSTEMS | [2018/07] | English: | POSITIONING REFERENCE SYSTEM (PRS) DESIGN ENHANCEMENT | [2018/07] | French: | AMÉLIORATION APPORTÉE À LA CONCEPTION D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT (PRS) | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012015667 (WOO KYUNGSOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0152] * * claims 1,9 * [I] 3-9,12-18,21-24; | [A]US2012040696 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] *; | [XI]US2014349582 (XIAO DENGKUN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-18 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0189] * * paragraph [0195] * [I] 3-9,12-18,21-24; | [A]WO2015026278 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-24* the whole document * |