EP3230042 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SET OF BODYWORK PARTS BY CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERAULT, Richard 17 Rue Raphaël Massard 69740 Genas / FR | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Andrieux, Benoît LLR 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15823627.3 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015FR53393 | Priority number, date | FR20140062331 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: FR 1462331 | [2017/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016092213 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230042 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/00, B29L31/30 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B29C66/02241 (EP,CN);
B29C65/00 (EP,CN);
B29C66/0246 (EP,CN);
B29C66/112 (EP,CN);
B29C66/1142 (EP,CN);
B29C66/131 (EP,CN);
B29C66/1312 (EP,CN);
B29C66/244 (EP,CN);
B29C66/54 (EP,CN);
B29C66/723 (EP,CN);
B29C2791/009 (EP,CN);
B29C2793/0081 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Validation states | MA | 06.06.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SATZES VON KAROSSERIEBAUTEILEN DURCH SCHNEIDEN | [2017/42] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SET OF BODYWORK PARTS BY CUTTING | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE PIÈCES DE CARROSSERIE PAR DÉCOUPE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2421936 (SPEIDEL KUNSTSTOFFWERK KG) [A] 1,8* figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO2011101412 (FAURECIA EXTERIORS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 3; claim 10 *; | [A]WO2014108240 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, lines 1-2; figure 1; claim 4 * * page 3, lines 12-17 * * page 4, lines 2-7 * | Examination | WO2016075411 |