EP3240607 - POWER CHARGING FOR MODULAR MEDCIAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELISLE, Norman Maurice c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GUINEY, Patrick c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/12] |
Former [2017/45] | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15823797.4 | 18.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015IB59758 | Priority number, date | US201462097782P | 30.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462097782 P | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108132 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3240607 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3240607 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, H02J7/34, // A61N1/36 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H02J7/342 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (CN);
A61N1/3975 (EP,US);
A61N1/36014 (CN);
A61N1/39 (CN);
A61N1/3904 (EP,US);
A61N1/3925 (US);
A61B2560/0214 (US);
A61N1/3603 (EP,US);
H02J2310/23 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | A61N1/378, H02J7/00, A61N1/39, A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMLADUNG FÜR MODULARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/45] | English: | POWER CHARGING FOR MODULAR MEDCIAL DEVICES | [2017/45] | French: | CHARGE D'ALIMENTATION POUR DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX MODULAIRES | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2023 | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007170887 (HARGUTH ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0039] * [I] 2-5; | [I]US2008221397 (MCMAHON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0072] *; | [A]US2012158075 (KAIB THOMAS E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0042] - [0093] *; | [I]US2014142647 (MCMAHON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0070] *; | [XD]US8788038 (NEUMILLER JAMES S [US], et al) [XD] 1-9 * abstract * * columns 4-11 * | by applicant | US8788038 |