EP3252040 - STABILIZER FOR PRESERVING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BGI Shenzhen Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Qiang Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Mo Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Liang Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jun Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518083 / CN | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/49] | 01 /
FENG, Qiang Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518083 / CN | ||
02 /
HAN, Mo Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518083 / CN | |||
03 /
XIAO, Liang Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518083 / CN | |||
04 /
WANG, Jun Main Building Beishan Industrial Zone Yantian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518083 / CN | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/16] |
Former [2017/49] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15824310.5 | 27.01.2015 | [2017/49] | WO2015CN71608 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011798 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252040 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3252040 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/16, C12N9/96, C07D213/20 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
C07D213/20 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
A01N1/0205 (US);
C07D213/16 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | C07D213/16, C12N9/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISATOR ZUR KONSERVIERUNG BIOLOGISCHER PROBEN | [2017/49] | English: | STABILIZER FOR PRESERVING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | [2017/49] | French: | AGENT STABILISANT POUR CONSERVER DES ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2017 | Translation filed | 21.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 21.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1736542 (OHNO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007022483 (BIOVENTURES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-16 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2010025859 (UNIV ROSTOCK [DE], et al) [I] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2012018638 (BIOMATRICA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples 1-12; claims 1-32; tables 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2012018639 (BIOMATRICA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples 1-5; claims 1-32; tables 1-5 * | International search | [X]CN1829739 (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-27 * , description, page 16, paragraph 3 to page 20, paragraph 1, page 12, paragraph 2, and page 13, paragraph 1 *; | [A]CN101484576 (NOVO NORDISK HEALTHCARE AG [CH]) [A] 1-27 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102333788 (NOVO NORDISK AS) [A] 1-27 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103540575 (KINETA TWO LLC) [A] 1-27* , the whole document * | Examination | - HAO LILAN ET AL, "Ionic liquid-based reagents improve the stability of midterm fecal sample storage", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170513), vol. 139, doi:10.1016/J.MIMET.2017.05.005, ISSN 0167-7012, pages 68 - 73, XP085110898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mimet.2017.05.005 |