EP3162904 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PELLETS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IRON-NICKEL ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Junichi c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Taku c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 03 /
OKADA, Shuuji c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15824513.4 | 30.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015JP68853 | Priority number, date | JP20140151977 | 25.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014151977 | [2017/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016013355 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162904 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3162904 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/24, C22B23/02 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C22B1/2406 (EP,US);
C22C33/0235 (US);
C21B15/00 (US);
C22B23/023 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | C22B1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PELLETS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER EISEN-NICKEL-LEGIERUNG | [2017/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PELLETS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IRON-NICKEL ALLOY | [2017/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE GRANULÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ALLIAGE DE FER-NICKEL | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | Translation filed | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2015 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | IE | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | LU | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3849113 (BAN T) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1400505 (AVESTA JERNVERKS AB) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4042375 (MARTIN ANWYN MARGARET, et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102534194 (BEIJING GEN RES INST MINING) [A] 1-5; | [A]CN103451451 (UNIV BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH08199249 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004156140 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2005/0211020 A1 & US 2007/0113708 A1 & WO 2004/035847 A1 & EP 1553196 A1 & EP 1867736 A1 * |