EP3172197 - BENZIMIDAZOLE RETINOIC ACID RECEPTOR-RELATED ORPHAN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innov17 LLC 760 Parkside Avenue Suite 208 Brooklyn, NY 11226 / US | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TILLEY, Jefferson 2540 NW Brickyard Street Bend, OR 97701 / US | 02 /
BLINN, James 693 Rolling Thunder Drive O'fallon, MO 63368 / US | 03 /
GAWECO, Anderson 760 Parkside Avenue Suite 208 Brooklyn, NY 11226 / US | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15824803.9 | 24.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015US41939 | Priority number, date | US201462029094P | 25.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462029094 P | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016014918 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172197 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/445, A61K31/55, A61P1/00, A61P11/00, A61P17/06, A61P29/00 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C07D487/08 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D417/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | BENZIMIDAZOLRETINSÄUREREZEPTORVERWANDTE WAISENREZEPTORMODULATOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/22] | English: | BENZIMIDAZOLE RETINOIC ACID RECEPTOR-RELATED ORPHAN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND USES THEREOF | [2017/22] | French: | MODULATEURS À BASE DE BENZIMIDAZOLE DU RÉCEPTEUR ORPHELIN LIÉ AU RÉCEPTEUR DE L'ACIDE RÉTINOÏQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 21.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014028597 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2013159095 (GAWECO ANDERSON [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - * | International search | [Y]WO2014028597 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US]) [Y] 1-19, 20A, 20B, 21-23, 24/1, 24/21, 25/1, 25/21, 26/25/1, 26/25/21, 27/25/1, 27/25/21 * ; page 3, lines 22-26; page 4, lines 1-26; page 5, lines 1-4, 11; page 16, lines 20-26; page 17, lines 6-14; page 18, lines 13-22; page 19, lines 4-12; page 20, lines 8-23; page 24, lines 7-15; page 29, lines 28-31; page 30, lines 1-2; page 31, lines 11-14 *; | [Y]WO2013037960 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) [Y] 1-19, 20A, 20B, 21-23, 24/1, 24/21, 25/1, 25/21, 26/25/1, 26/25/21, 27/25/1, 27/25/21 * ; page 4; lines 18-26 *; | [Y]US2007054903 (KIM TAE-SEONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-19, 20A, 20B, 21-23, 24/1, 24/21, 25/1, 25/21, 26/25/1, 26/25/21, 27/25/1, 27/25/21 * ; paragraphs [0011], [0031], [0038], [0044], [0046], [0049]-[0054], [0111], [0114], [0118]-[0121], [0154] *; | [A]WO2013159095 (GAWECO ANDERSON [US], et al) [A] 1-19, 20A, 20B, 21-23, 24/1, 24/21, 25/1, 25/21, 26/25/1, 26/25/21, 27/25/1, 27/25/21 * ; paragraphs [0010]-[0011], [0014], [0034], [0036], [0053] *; | [A]US6300342 (HECKEL ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19, 20A, 20B, 21-23, 24/1, 24/21, 25/1, 25/21, 26/25/1, 26/25/21, 27/25/1, 27/25/21 * ; entire document * |