EP3172580 - NANOPIPETTE ANALYSIS OF POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mir, Kalim 30 Elmwood Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15825292.4 | 24.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015US42123 | Priority number, date | US201462029382P | 25.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462029382 P | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016015018 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172580 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/44, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, B01L3/02, B82Y5/00, G01N33/487 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6825 (EP,US);
B01L3/021 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
G01N33/48721 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
G01Q60/44 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0663 (EP,US);
B01L2200/143 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0896 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0421 (US);
B01L2400/043 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/631 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/631 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/22] | G01Q60/44, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68, B01L3/02, B82Y5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | NANOPIPETTENANALYSE VON POLYMEREN | [2017/22] | English: | NANOPIPETTE ANALYSIS OF POLYMERS | [2017/22] | French: | ANALYSE DE POLYMÈRES PAR NANOPIPETTE | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 22.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/52] | 24.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2018 | 31.07.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - KARHANEK M ET AL, "Single DNA Molecule Detection Using Nanopipettes and Nanoparticles", NANO LETTERS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1021/NL0480464, ISSN 1530-6984, (20050125), pages 403 - 407, (20050125), XP002499904 [X] 1-3 * figures 3-5 * * page 403, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 404, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 404, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 404, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 405, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl0480464 | [Y] - KERSTIN GÖPFRICH ET AL, "Lipid Nanobilayers to Host Biological Nanopores for DNA Translocations", LANGMUIR, US, (20130108), vol. 29, no. 1, doi:10.1021/la3041506, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 355 - 364, XP055485933 [Y] 11 * figures 2,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la3041506 | [AD] - JOANNE L. GORNALL ET AL, "Simple Reconstitution of Protein Pores in Nano Lipid Bilayers", NANO LETTERS, US, (20110810), vol. 11, no. 8, doi:10.1021/nl201707d, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 3334 - 3340, XP055485926 [AD] 1-3,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl201707d | International search | [A]RU2407021 (NANOTEKHNOLOGIJA MDT AOZT [RU]) [A] 1-20, 25* , abstract, claims *; | [Y]US2011131690 (NOVAK PAVEL [GB], et al) [Y] 7-15, 17-20 * , paragraphs [0029],[0032],[0057],[0061],[0091], [0093], fig. 1 *; | [XY] - WILKINS S.J. et al., "Scanning Ion Conductance Microscopy: Zero Force Imaging of Living Cells.", Microscopy and analysis scanning probe microscopy supplement, (20080300), pages S11 - S13, XP 055394713 [X] 1, 3-6, 16, 25 [Y] 2, 7-15, 17-20 | [Y] - HAPPEL P. et al., "Scanning ion conductance microscopy for Studying Biological Samples.", Sensors, (20120000), pages 14983 - 15008, XP055389599 [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s121114983 |