15.01.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
17.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
08.09.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
21.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.09.2019 |
First examination report |
|
31.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
12.07.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
07.07.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
08.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|