EP3172993 - PILLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roh, Geun Ho 495 Cheoinseong-ro Namsa-myeon Cheoin-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-885 / KR | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15825351.8 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015KR04224 | Priority number, date | KR20140093985 | 24.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140093985 | [2017/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016013756 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172993 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47G9/10 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A47G9/109 (EP,US);
A47G9/1081 (US);
A47G2009/1018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | KISSEN | [2017/22] | English: | PILLOW | [2017/22] | French: | OREILLER | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2017 | Translation filed | 24.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4916765 (CASTRONOVO JR JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 6,7 * figure - *; | [XY]US5519907 (POTHS HORST [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US2002050007 (KIM CHANG-GYU [KR]) [Y] 4,5 * figure 10 *; | [X]US7594288 (HOLLIDAY JAMES MIKE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure - *; | [X]CN201806373U (QIAN XU) [X] 1-3* figure 2 * | International search | [A]KR200331940Y (SHIN, Wan Chul) [A] 1-7 * See page 3; figures 1-5. *; | [A]KR100984623B (KANG, Jig Won) [A] 1-7* See abstract; and figures 5-8 *; | [XY]JP2011167325 (FOOTCARE CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 6-7 * See paragraphs [0045], [0067], [0072]; claims 1-2; and figures 1-5, 9-10. * [Y] 4-5; | [A]KR200460780Y (T&I CO., LTD. et al.) [A] 1-7 * See abstract; and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR200469838Y (OH, Min - Ji) [Y] 4-5 * See abstract; claim 1; and figures 2-4. * |