EP3139216 - DEVELOPER STORAGE CONTAINER, AND IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETO, Daisuke c/o KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 2-28 Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15826552.0 | 17.06.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015JP67489 | Priority number, date | JP20140154762 | 30.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014154762 | [2017/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016017312 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139216 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139216 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
G03G15/0872 (EP,US);
G03G15/0889 (US);
G03G15/08 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTWICKLERLAGERUNGSBEHÄLTER UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/10] | English: | DEVELOPER STORAGE CONTAINER, AND IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | [2017/10] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE STOCKAGE DE RÉVÉLATEUR, ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2016 | Translation filed | 01.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2015 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | IE | 17.06.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2015 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000187382 (CANON KK) [X] 1,10* abstract *; | [XA]US2014079439 (ABLER JEFFREY ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * paragraph [0060]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0079] * [A] 8 | International search | [XYA]JP2000187382 (CANON KK) [X] 1, 3-4, 10 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 11 [A] 5-9; | [Y]JP2001092230 (NASHUA CORP) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0049]; fig. 1 to 2 & EP 1076271 A1 *; | [A]JP2007212766 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-11* , paragraphs [0061] to [0066]; fig. 5 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014102461 (KYOCERA DOCUMENT SOLUTIONS INC) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0004], [0057]; fig. 5 to 6 (Family: none) * |