EP3174437 - MATTRESS ASSEMBLY INCLUDING MATTRESS OVERLAY AND MULTIPLE COVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tempur-Pedic Management, LLC 1000 Tempur Way Lexington, KY 40511 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Ida T. Frederiksgade 9, 4. tv 5000 Odense C / DK | 02 /
OBERWELZ, Elger 1413 San Bruno Ave San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 03 /
OVERTHUN, Thomas D. C. 153 Divisadero Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 04 /
SCHNITZER, Martin 305 Persia Ave San Francisco, CA 94112 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, Kara W. 59 Nelson Ave Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US | 06 /
PFISTER, Brent P. 3104 Chadbourn Lane Lexington, KY 40513 / US | 07 /
DIAS DE MELLO SA, Isabela 1226 Church Street, Apt. 3 San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 08 /
BRISEBRAS, Thomas 818 York Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 09 /
LOPEZ, Eric 1829 15th Street 4 San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15826689.0 | 23.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015US41655 | Priority number, date | US201462029871P | 28.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462029871 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016018703 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174437 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/00, A47C31/02, A47C31/10 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A47C27/008 (EP,US);
A47C27/001 (US);
A47C27/006 (US);
A47C27/053 (US);
A47C27/06 (US);
A47C27/08 (US);
A47C27/10 (US);
A47C27/15 (US);
A47C27/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | MATRATZENANORDNUNG MIT MATRATZENSCHUTZ UND MEHREREN ABDECKUNGEN | [2017/23] | English: | MATTRESS ASSEMBLY INCLUDING MATTRESS OVERLAY AND MULTIPLE COVERS | [2017/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MATELAS COMPRENANT UN SURMATELAS ET DE MULTIPLES COUVRE-MATELAS | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5136741 (BALONICK ARNOLD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,13,17-20 * figures 1-6 *[I] 5,10,11,14-16,19; | [X]JP3047366U (N.N.) [X] 1,2,19,20 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]US6804848 (ROSE ERIC [US]) [X] 1-3,19,20 * figures 2-3 * | International search | [Y]US3530487 (BEER ANDREW E) [Y] 17 * See column 4, lines 4-21 and figure 4. *; | [XY]US5136741 (BALONICK ARNOLD [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4, 6-13, 18-20 * See column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 57 and figures 1-3. * [Y] 3, 5, 14-17; | [Y]US2005210595 (DI STASIO ANTHONY A [US], et al) [Y] 3 * See paragraph [0033] and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2008098533 (ERDMAN THOMAS C [US]) [Y] 5, 14-16 * See paragraphs [0015], [0045] and figure 1. *; | [A]US8181293 (DEFRANKS MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 42 and figure 1. * |